House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2022
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|