Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0985 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 15, 2022