House
|
03/08/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 988
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
PCS added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2022
|
Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|