Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0987 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 27, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill January 31, 2022