Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 17, 2022