House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/27/2021 | Filed |