House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|