Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1037 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022