House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 1054
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|