Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022