House
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1408
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 918793 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|