Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022