House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|