Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable with CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|