Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022