Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 76, NAYS 37
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment 484809 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment 792779 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2022
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Original reference removed: Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
PCS added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|