House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Filed |