House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Filed |