Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022