House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Original reference removed: Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|