Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022