House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Filed |