Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022