House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|