Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1291 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022