House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Filed |