House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|