Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 5, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022