House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 1712
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|