Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2022