House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|