Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Received | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | In Messages | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | Filed |