Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022