House
|
03/08/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1796
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|