Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 6, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022
Bill January 28, 2022