House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | Filed |