House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |