House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|