Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1461 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022