House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |