|
03/28/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-21
|
|
|
|
03/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/22/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 79, NAYS 41
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amendment 745288 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 24 NAYS 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (745288)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Rules (745288); YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 78, NAYS 40
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Amendment 059043 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|