House | 03/07/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1534 | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |