Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022