Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2022
Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 5, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022