House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |