|
03/29/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-22
|
|
|
|
03/28/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/28/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment(s) failed (175814, 201756, 290096, 374376, 421704, 427586, 486826, 538822, 734244, 745072, 755282, 756788, 907198) 716, 717
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 69, NAYS 47
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 138729 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 275051 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 194533 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 722367 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 870647 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 634251 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 600607 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 703365 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 705429 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 178971 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 784679 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Amendment 884605 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|