Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022