House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/20/2021 | Filed |