House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/12/2021 | Filed |