House | 03/14/2022 | See HB 5001 (line item 691) | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Removed from Meeting Agenda of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/27/2021 | Filed |